CA AB1985 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 300, 306, 16501.1, 16501.35, 16501.45, 16524.6, 16524.7, 16524.8, 16524.9, and 16524.10 of, and to repeal Section 16524.11 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to human trafficking.
Title
Dependency: victims of human trafficking.
Sponsors
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] |
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. |
2020-01-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 23. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16501.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16501.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16501.45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16524.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16524.11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16524.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16524.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16524.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16524.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 306 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1985 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1985 |