CA AB1985 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 422.56 of, and to add Chapter 2.5 (commencing with Section 422.87) to Title 11.6 of Part 1 of, the Penal Code, relating to hate crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hate crimes: law enforcement policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Assembly - AB 1985 TING Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15).
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-03-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-03-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 4265.)
2018-03-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-03-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 6).
2018-03-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
2018-01-31AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code422.56Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code422.87New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback