CA AB1985 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 513, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 513, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 9 (commencing with Section 79500) to Chapter 9 of Part 48 of Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to Advanced Placement credit.
Title
Advanced Placement credit.
Sponsors
Asm. Das Williams [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Asm. Marc Steinorth [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-23 - Assembly - AB 1985 WILLIAMS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1985 Williams By Block (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1985 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1985 Williams By Block (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1985 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 513, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 4. Page 6111.). |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5024.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 4895.) |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 1.) (May 11). |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 79500 | New Code | See Bill Text |