CA AB1981 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 20119, 20119.1, 20119.2, 20119.3, 20119.5, and 20119.7 of the Public Contract Code, relating to best value procurement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Los Angeles Unified School District: best value procurement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 1981 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-07-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29).
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 4.)
2020-05-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-05-11AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 6).
2020-03-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-02-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2020-02-24AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2020-02-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2020-01-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
2020-01-23AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback