CA AB1980 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 3 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 338.1 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to statute of limitations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statute of limitations: hazardous materials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1980 Quirk By Wieckowski (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 1980 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-07-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 5044.).
2018-06-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 12).
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Coms. on EQ. and JUD.
2018-04-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 1. Page 4891.)
2018-04-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17).
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD.
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
2018-01-31AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure338.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback