CA AB1977 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1374.73 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10144.51 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: behavioral diagnoses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-28 - Assembly - AB 1977 Ta Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1977 Ta et al. By Menjivar (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1977 Ta Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1977 Ta et al. By Menjivar (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1977 Ta Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-22 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2024-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.). |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 29). |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5087.) |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1374.73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10144.51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |