CA AB1977 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 430, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to state real property, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State real property: surplus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 1977 A & A.R. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By EGGMAN (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Special Consent AB1977 A. & A.R (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 1977 A & A.R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 430, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-17 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-20AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6352.).
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5285.).
2018-08-01SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2018-06-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-06-04SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-04-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4899.)
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-21AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-02-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
2018-01-31AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code15854.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback