CA AB1977 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 55.5 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Department of Industrial Relations: ombudsman.
Sponsors
Asm. Paul Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |
2010-04-06 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2010-04-05 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2010-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |