CA AB1975 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 5 (commencing with Section 50410) to Chapter 2 of Part 1 of Division 1 of Title 5 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: bus shelters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS. |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 50410 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |