CA AB1972 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-02 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Banking and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-02 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Banking and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 4.5 (commencing with Section 1924) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, and to add Sections 17134.5 and 24273.6 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to obligations.
Title
Income share agreements: postsecondary training: gross income exclusion.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Choi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and REV. & TAX. |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1924 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17134.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 24273.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1972 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1972 |