CA AB1971 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 22584 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to personal information.
Title
Student Online Personal Information Protection Act: administration of standardized tests.
Sponsors
Asm. Dawn Addis [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Assembly - AB 1971 Addis Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.) |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar by request of Assembly Member Essayli. To Third Reading. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and ED. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22584 | Amended Code | Citation Text |