CA AB1971 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-06 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-06 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 3.3 (commencing with Section 20119) of Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 2 of the Public Contract Code, relating to best value procurement.
Title
Los Angeles Unified School District: best value procurement: pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1971 BOCANEGRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1971 BOCANEGRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 4). |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 25). |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 17. Page 5099.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 52051.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20119 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |