CA AB1970 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10058, 11052.5, 18901.6, 18914, and 18926 of, and to add Sections 10003, 11023.6, 11023.7, 11023.8, and 11322.81 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Social Services Modernization and Efficiency Act of 2012.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] | Asm. Gilbert Cedillo [D] | Sen. Isadore Hall [D] | Asm. Jared Huffman [D] |
Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Assembly - AB 1970 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Assembly - AB 1970 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-26 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-06-18 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-15 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (June 12). | |
2012-06-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2012-05-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 24. Page 4666.) | |
2012-04-26 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 25). | |
2012-04-23 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-19 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-11 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10003 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10058 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11023.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11023.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11023.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11052.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11322.81 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18901.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18914 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |