CA AB197 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 250, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 250, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 7.6 (commencing with Section 9147.10) to Chapter 1.5 of Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 2 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 39510 and 39607 of, and to add Sections 38506, 38531, 38562.5, and 38562.7 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to air resources.
Title
State Air Resources Board: greenhouse gases: regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Assembly - AB 197 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 45 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB197 Eduardo Garcia By Pavley (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 197 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB197 Eduardo Garcia By Pavley (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 197 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 250, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 24). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6201.) Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6201.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 45. Noes 30. Page 6202.). |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6114.) |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 5231.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 5252.). |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29). |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 1778.) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 28). |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 27). |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2015-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 9147.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38506 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38531 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38562.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38562.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39607 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 636 | New Code | See Bill Text |