CA AB1969 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 99268.2 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation funds: transportation planning agencies: transit operators: fare revenue ratios: exemptions.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 99268.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1969 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1969 |