CA AB1963 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 71, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 71, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6000 of the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments: construction defects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1963 Calderon (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - AB 1963 CALDERON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - AB 1963 CALDERON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 71, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-07-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4646.). |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4231.) |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2016-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 6000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |