CA AB1952 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11465 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.
Title
Foster care: infant supplement.
Sponsors
Asm. Diane Dixon [R] | Asm. Juan Alanis [R] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 29. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11465 | Amended Code | Citation Text |