CA AB1950 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 328, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1203a and 1203.1 of the Penal Code, relating to probation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Probation: length of terms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1950 Kamlager et al. By Mitchell (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 1950 Kamlager Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 328, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2020-08-27AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2020-08-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-24SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12.).
2020-08-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-13SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2020-08-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-06-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 22. Page 4851.)
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4746.)
2020-06-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 7.) (June 2).
2020-05-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-21AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2020-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 19).
2020-05-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-05-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2020-01-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-01-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
2020-01-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1203Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1203.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback