CA AB1950 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2016 - 50% progression
Action: 2016-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 2538.58 and 2539.3 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to hearing aids.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hearing aids: audio switch.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-01 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - AB 1950 MAIENSCHEIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-11SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2016-08-01SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2016-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2016-05-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2016-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4959.)
2016-05-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2016-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 18).
2016-04-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-04-25AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2016-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 19).
2016-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2016-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2016-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code2538.49Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2538.58New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code2539.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1950&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1950_bill_20160212_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1950_bill_20160425_amended_asm_v98.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1950_vote_20160419_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1950_vote_20160518_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1950_vote_20160527_1038AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1950_vote_20160627_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1950_vote_20160801_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback