CA AB1940 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 49419 of the Education Code, and to amend Sections 124174, 124174.2, 124174.3, and 124174.4 of, to amend and renumber Section 124174.6 of, and to repeal Section 124174.5 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
School-Based Health Center Support Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1940 Salas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1940 Salas By Hurtado (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1940 Salas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1940 Salas By Hurtado (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1940 Salas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 11.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5055.). |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 10. Page 5029.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on ED.) |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4359.) |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED. |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49419 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 124174 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 124174.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 124174.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 124174.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 124174.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |