CA AB1936 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 68074 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: residency: dependents of armed forces members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1936 CHAVEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1936 CHAVEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4786.) |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and V.A. |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2016-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 68074 | Amended Code | Citation Text |