CA AB1934 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 70, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 70, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 177 of the Evidence Code, to amend Sections 288, 368, and 1336 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 15610.23 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to dependent persons.
Title
Dependent persons: definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1934 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Assembly - AB 1934 JONES-SAWYER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Assembly - AB 1934 JONES-SAWYER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 70, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-06-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4878.). |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 4265.) |
2018-03-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 6). |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-01-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 24. |
2018-01-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 177 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1336 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 288 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 368 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15610.23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |