CA AB1927 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 241, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1324.2 to the Penal Code, relating to criminal process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Witness testimony in sexual assault cases: inadmissability in a separate prosecution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1927 Boerner Horvath Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1927 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 1927 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 241, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-08AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2020-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2020-08-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-08-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 31).
2020-07-02SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4748.)
2020-03-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-03-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 10).
2020-03-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-03-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2020-01-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-01-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
2020-01-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1324.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback