CA AB1921 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 465 to the Penal Code, relating to theft.
Title
Unlawful entry of a vehicle.
Sponsors
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] | Asm. Tyler Diep [R] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Asm. Vince Fong [R] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] |
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 13. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 465 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1921 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1921 |