CA AB192 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 65863.15 to the Government Code, relating to zoning violations.
Title
Zoning violation: hotel operation.
Sponsors
Asm. Curt Hagman [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65863.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |