CA AB1915 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 27388.1 of the Government Code, relating to document recording, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Building Homes and Jobs Act: recording fee: mining claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2018-01-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 23. |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 27388.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |