CA AB1914 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 3.6 (commencing with Section 78264) to Chapter 2 of Part 48 of Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: providers of care for individuals with developmental disabilities: model curriculum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-01-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 24. |
2024-01-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 78264 | New Code | See Bill Text |