CA AB1913 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 28. Noes 32. Page 5658.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 28. Noes 32. Page 5658.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 9998 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to foreign labor contractors.
Title
Foreign labor contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1913 KALRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 32 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 28. Noes 32. Page 5658.). |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2018-01-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 23. |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 9998 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |