CA AB1911 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 11166.6 to the Penal Code, relating to child abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child abuse reporting: cross-reporting among local agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2018-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Reconsideration refused.
2018-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage.
2018-04-19Assembly(pending re-refer to Com. on HUM. S.)
2018-04-19AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4773.)
2018-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Further hearing to be set.
2018-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-20AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-03-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-03-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-01-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
2018-01-23AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code11166.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback