CA AB191 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 184, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 5251, 5261, and 5270.20 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health: involuntary treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB191 Wood By Hernandez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Assembly - AB 191 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 184, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-01 Approved by the Governor.
2017-08-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2173.).
2017-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21).
2017-05-30SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-03-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-03-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 841.)
2017-03-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 21).
2017-01-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-01-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
2017-01-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback