CA AB1906 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 860, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 860, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 1.81.26 (commencing with Section 1798.91.04) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to information privacy.
Title
Information privacy: connected devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1906 IRWIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1906 Irwin et al. By Jackson (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1906 IRWIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1906 Irwin et al. By Jackson (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1906 IRWIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 860, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 6990.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 5966.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 26). |
2018-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 5371.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (May 1). |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22948.30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1798.91.04 | New Code | See Bill Text |