CA AB1904 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 3073.7 of the Labor Code, and to add and repeal Sections 17053.14, 19560.3, and 23668 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: credits: apprenticeships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 12). |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3073.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.14 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19560.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23668 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |