CA AB19 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Division 4.5 (commencing with Section 4500) to the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Internet Voting Pilot Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2014-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2013-05-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
2013-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2013-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 23).
2013-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2013-04-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2013-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2013-03-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2013-03-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2012-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2012-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code4500New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback