CA AB19 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 8.5 (commencing with Section 537) to Division 1 of the Water Code, relating to water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Building standards: water meters: multiunit structures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-27 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Housing and Community Development (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-01 Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2012-01-09 In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2012-01-04 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2011-04-27 In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
2011-04-25 Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2011-04-15 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2011-03-24 Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2011-03-23 Read second time and amended.
2011-03-22 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 22).
2011-03-21 Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
2011-03-17 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended.
2011-01-24 Referred to Coms. on W., P. & W. and H. & C.D.
2010-12-07 From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
2010-12-06 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code17922.14New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code537New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_19&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_19_bill_20101206_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_19_bill_20110317_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_19_bill_20110323_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_19_bill_20110415_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_19_bill_20120104_amended_asm_v95.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_19_vote_20110322_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_19_vote_20110427_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_19_vote_20110427_000002_asm_comm.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback