CA AB19 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-27 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Division 27.5 (commencing with Section 44570) to the Health and Safety Code, relating to product labeling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Greenhouse gas emissions: consumer product labeling.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 19 RUSKIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-08-27 In committee: Held under submission.
2009-08-17 In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
2009-07-20 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2009-07-07 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 6).
2009-06-18 Referred to Com. on EQ.
2009-06-03 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-06-02 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 32. Page 1926.)
2009-05-29 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
2009-05-20 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2009-05-05 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-05-04 Read second time and amended.
2009-04-30 Action rescinded whereby the bill was reported from committee with author's amendments and whereby the bill was read second time and amended on April 20 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 13).
2009-04-21 Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2009-04-20 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2009-02-05 Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2008-12-02 From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
2008-12-01 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code44570New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_19&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_19_bill_20081201_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_19_bill_20090504_amended_asm_v98.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_19_vote_20090413_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_19_vote_20090528_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_19_vote_20090602_1111AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_19_vote_20090706_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_19_vote_20090817_000002_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback