CA AB189 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 11 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-09-18 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 51221.1 to the Education Code, relating to school curriculum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School curriculum: model curriculum: service learning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 189 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB189 Low By Portantino (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 189 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-18AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-09-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (September 1).
2017-07-17SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-15SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 13. Page 1952.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
2017-04-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-27AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 15).
2017-01-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-01-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
2017-01-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code51221.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code51225.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback