CA AB1889 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17935, 17941, 17948, and 23153 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, as tax levy.
Title
Minimum franchise tax: annual tax: small business.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17935 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17941 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17948 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |