CA AB1884 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 576, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 576, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5.2 (commencing with Section 42270) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to food facilities.
Title
Food facilities: single-use plastic straws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-23 - Assembly - AB 1884 CALDERON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1884 Calderon et al. By Stern (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1884 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1884 Calderon et al. By Stern (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1884 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 576, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 6492.). |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5440.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 20). |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 5463.) |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 23). |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 23). |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 17. |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 114082 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42270 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42359 | New Code | See Bill Text |