CA AB1883 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12743 of, and to add Article 16.8 (commencing with Section 1758.1000) to Chapter 5 of Part 2 of Division 1 of, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: home protection contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. |
2024-01-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 12743 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1758.1000 | New Code | See Bill Text |