CA AB1880 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 120132 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Valley Fever reporting.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 17. |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 120130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120132 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1880 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1880 |