CA AB188 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8223 of the Education Code, relating to child care.
Title
Child care: alternative payment providers: reimbursement rates: eligibility requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-01-28 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. |
2015-01-27 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8223 | Amended Code | Citation Text |