CA AB188 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 202, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 202, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 205.5 and 279 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Property tax exemption: principal residence: veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] | Asm. Robert Blumenfield [D] | Asm. Betsy Butler [D] | Asm. Nathan Fletcher [R] |
Asm. Curt Hagman [R] | Asm. Kevin Jeffries [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-08-15 - Assembly - AB 188 BLOCK Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-07-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB188 Block (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Assembly - AB 188 BLOCK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB188 Block (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Assembly - AB 188 BLOCK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 202, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-08-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2011-08-15 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2378.). | |
2011-07-14 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-07-14 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1863.). | |
2011-07-11 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-07-07 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-29 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-06-27 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-08 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-04-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-04-14 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 982.) | |
2011-04-07 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 6). | |
2011-03-08 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2011-01-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. | |
2011-01-25 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 205.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 279 | Amended Code | Citation Text |