CA AB188 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 645, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 645, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to public health, making an appropriation therefore, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Medi-Cal: quality assurance fee revenue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-10-26 - Assembly - AB 188 Jones Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2009-10-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB188 Jones Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-10-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB188 Committee on BUDGET (Evans) Suspend Joint Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 188 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By EVANS (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2009-10-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB188 Jones Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-10-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB188 Committee on BUDGET (Evans) Suspend Joint Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 188 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By EVANS (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 645, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-11-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-10-27 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2009-10-26 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after October 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 61. Noes 8. Page 3550.) | |
2009-10-14 | Joint Rule 61(a)(13) suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 2519.) Read third time and amended. Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2520.) Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 2532.) | |
2009-09-08 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-09-04 | Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-09-03 | From inactive file. To second reading. | |
2009-08-20 | To inactive file on motion of Senator Ducheny. | |
2009-06-15 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-11 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-05-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-04 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 0. Page 1226.) | |
2009-04-29 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-27 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2009-02-03 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. | |
2009-02-02 | Read first time. To print. |