CA AB1877 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 24214.1 to the Education Code, relating to state teachers’ retirement.
Title
State teachers’ retirement: retirees.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 24214.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |