CA AB1876 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 87, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 87, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17052 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Personal income taxes: federal individual taxpayer identification number: earned income tax credits: young child tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1876 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1876 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 1876 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1876 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 1876 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 87, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 5439.). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 5435.) |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 10.). |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 29). |
2020-08-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 4868.) |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 4273.) |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052 | Amended Code | Citation Text |