CA AB1876 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 29703.5, 29722.5, 29739, 29759, 29761.5, and 29773 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend and repeal Section 85057 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 85022, 85055, and 85301 of, to add Sections 85205 and 85300.5 to, and to add Chapter 1.1 (commencing with Section 85206) to Part 3 of Division 35 of, the Water Code, relating to the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta.
Title
Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta: Delta Plan: administration.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 0 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 29703.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 29722.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 29739 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 29759 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 29761.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 29773 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 85022 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 85055 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 85057 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 85061 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 85066.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 85200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 85200.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 85301 | New Code | See Bill Text |