CA AB1873 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 583, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 583, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 6509.6, 16480.45, and 20194.5 to the Government Code, and to amend Section 11797 of the Insurance Code, relating to Property Assessed Clean Energy Bonds.
Title
Property Assessed Clean Energy (PACE) bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-20 - Assembly - AB 1873 HUFFMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1873 Huffman By Pavley (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1873 HUFFMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1873 Huffman By Pavley (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1873 HUFFMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 583, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-02 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:15 p.m. | |
2010-08-20 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 6445.) | |
2010-08-18 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-18 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 4582.) | |
2010-08-10 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-09 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). | |
2010-06-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 5511.) | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-05-12 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-28 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-27 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-26 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 19). | |
2010-04-06 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2010-04-05 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |
2010-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |