CA AB1872 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7.1 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 37220, 44988, 45203, 45205, 79020, 79030, 88203, 88205, and 89005.7 of, and to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 92070) to Chapter 1 of Part 57 of Division 9 of Title 3 of, the Education Code, to amend Section 1100 of the Elections Code, to amend Sections 6700, 19853, and 19853.1 of the Government Code, relating to elections.
Title
Election day holiday.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and G.O. |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 7.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 37220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44988 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 45203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 45205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 79020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 79030 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 89005.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 92070 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 1100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19853 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19853.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |