CA AB1872 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 26040 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 34010, 34012, and 34019 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to cannabis, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1872 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1872 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 1872 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.).
2020-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2020-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-31SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9.).
2020-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-27SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-08-25SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2020-08-24SenateJoint Rules 61 and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 10.)
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2020-06-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14.)
2020-03-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-03-09AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2020-03-09AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2020-03-09AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 4273.)
2020-02-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-02-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
2020-01-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-01-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
2020-01-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback