CA AB1870 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Enrolled on August 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 12960 of the Government Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment discrimination: limitation of actions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1870 REYES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1870 Reyes et al. By Leyva (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1870 REYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-21SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 16).
2018-07-02SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 4. Page 5390.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 25).
2018-05-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2018-01-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
2018-01-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12960Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12980Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback